1. |
Mr. Rafiqul Islam |
Executive Engineer(RHD) |
22-12-1992 to 03-03-1993 |
ছবি পাওয়া যায় নি |
|
2. |
Mr. Lutfor Rahman | 03-03-1993 to 29-03-1993 | |||
3. | Mr. Aftabuzzaman | 29-03-1993 to 22-09-1996 | |||
4. | Mr. Nihar Miya | 22-09-1996 to 30-07-1997 | |||
5. | Mr. Biswojet Dey | 30-07-1997 to 26-04-2000 | |||
6 | Mr. Mahbubul Alam | 26-04-2000 to 11-09-2002 | |||
7 | Mr. Md. Shafiullah | 11-09-2002 to 178-07-2004 | |||
8 | Mr. Mahbubul Alam | 17-07-2004 to 28-07-2004 | |||
9 | Mr. Md. Razaul Karim | 28-07-2004 to 15-08-2007 | |||
10 | Mr.Susil Kumar Saha | 15-08-2007 to 07-04-2010 | |||
11 | Mr. Mahbubul Alam Khan | 08-04-2010 to 30-10-2013 | |||
12 | Mr. Md. Abdur Rashid | 30-10-2013 to 07-11-2013 | |||
13 | Mr. Md. Tanvir Siddique | 07-11-1013 to 06-09-2016 | |||
14 | Mr. Md. Suruj Miya | 06-09-2016 to 27-09-2016 | |||
15 | Mr. A,K,M,Hamidur Rahman | 27-09-2016 to 18-07-2019 | |||
16 | Mr Md. Monzurul Karim | 18-07-2019 to | |||
Planning and Implementation: Cabinet Division, A2I, BCC, DoICT and BASIS